P.A.S.T.WAYS LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
INCLUSION OF ALL YOUNG PEOPLE OF PRIMARY AND SECONDARY SCHOOL AGE INCLUDING THE EDUCATIONAL, EMOTIONAL AND SOCIAL SUPPORT NEEDED BY THESE YOUNG PEOPLE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 25 October 2013: Standard registration
- PATHWAYS FOR YOUNG PEOPLE LIMITED (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shannon Hatfield | Trustee | 17 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Billy Craig Lewis | Trustee | 11 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura Elizabeth Knowles | Trustee | 15 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jade Belcher-Tyson | Trustee | 17 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Derrick Copeland | Trustee | 21 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martin Steven David Fisher | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julia Lee Dyson | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Nicole Belcher-Tyson | Trustee | 14 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Matthew James Barratt | Trustee | 14 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Kevin Belcher | Trustee | 14 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £144.25k | £193.68k | £152.89k | £199.56k | £209.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £139.65k | £139.98k | £146.96k | £184.72k | £176.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.90k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 23 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 23 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24/12/2012 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 25/02/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 23/09/2013 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 20 OCT 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE AGED 10 TO 16 YEARS OLD WHO HAVE BEEN IDENTIFIED AS HAVING NEEDS REQUIRING THE PROVISION OF ADDITIONAL EDUCATIONAL AND SOCIAL SUPPORT AND RELATED GUIDANCE IN ORDER TO ADVANCE THEIR EDUCATION AND DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ALLOW THEM TO RETURN TO FULL TIME EDUCATION, AND TO HELP THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE ADULTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
PAST Ways Ltd
Fisher Business Park
Green Lane
Ecclesfield
SHEFFIELD
S35 9WY
- Phone:
- 0114 245 7855
- Email:
- Pat.Booth@pastways.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window