THE UNITY OF FAITHS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
organise events with different religions, communities and cultures to promote education, youth development for community harmony.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- Belgium
- Iceland
- India
- Scotland
- United States
Governance
- 02 September 2013: Standard registration
- Kind20 (Working name)
- Liverpool International Music Festival (Working name)
- Liverpool International Song Contest (Working name)
- The Road to Nashville (Working name)
- TUFF (Working name)
- TUFF.EARTH (Working name)
- FOOTBALL FOR UNITY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ann Clare Bornholt | Chair | 11 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sandeep Singh | Trustee | 11 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Xander | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
SHAMENDER TALWAR PhD FRSA | Trustee | 02 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Grace Bian | Trustee | 08 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Harinder Bath | Trustee | 20 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter Bennetts | Trustee | 30 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Edwin Shukar | Trustee | 23 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Darren William Brown | Trustee | 27 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
FRIDJON FRIDJONSSON | Trustee | 22 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
MR JAI SAI SATISH | Trustee | 24 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
GURMAIL MALHI | Trustee | 23 July 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.91k | £21.79k | £60.90k | £69.65k | £37.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.52k | £28.91k | £60.36k | £63.92k | £144.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 31 July 2024 | 61 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 31 July 2024 | 61 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 02 August 2023 | 63 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 02 August 2023 | 63 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 29 July 2022 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 29 July 2022 | 59 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 30 September 2021 | 122 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 28 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 28 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10 JUL 2013
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (THE ‘OBJECTS’) ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: THE PROMOTION OF RELIGIOUS HARMONY AND UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN PEOPLE OF DIFFERENT FAITHS WORLDWIDE BY BRINGING COMMUNITY AND RELIGIOUS ORGANISATIONS TOGETHER, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE DIVERSITY OF FAITHS, TO REMOVE MISCONCEPTIONS AND PREJUDICE, AND ANY OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Apartment 159 Alexandra Tower
19 Princes Parade
LIVERPOOL
L3 1BJ
- Phone:
- 07393490551
- Email:
- info@tuff.earth
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window