Financial history BRISTOL STREET PASTORS

Charity number: 1153091
Charity reporting is up to date (12 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/07/2020 01/07/2021 01/07/2022 01/07/2023 01/07/2024
Total gross income £5.04k £8.22k £14.43k £4.05k £21.30k
Total expenditure £9.02k £8.31k £11.29k £6.37k £6.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A