Accounts and annual returns RED DRAGON PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1153018
Charity reporting is up to date (31 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 08 March 2025 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 08 March 2025 31 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 10 February 2024 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 10 February 2024 5 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 05 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 05 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 05 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 05 February 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 12 February 2021 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 12 February 2021 7 days late Download Open in new window