Bradford Inclusive Disability Service

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Bradford Toy Library provides a specialist toy & resource service to assist in the development of children with disabilities Interesting weekly theme days/events for Toy Library users are organised including an extensive summer holidays and school breaks scheme. Teenzone a social skills group 11+ Friday Friends a carers support group are part of the Toy Library
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income includes £13,100 from 3 government contract(s) and £13,100 from 3 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bradford City
Governance
- BRADFORD INCLUSIVE DISABILITY SERVICE (Previous name)
- BRADFORD METROPOLITAN DISTRICT TOY LIBRARY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
laura JACKSON | Trustee | 24 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
DEBORAH KESLER | Trustee | 12 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
VICTORIA PHILLIPS | Trustee | 12 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katie hansard | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
AMANDA WILSON | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £54.49k | £174.00k | £132.24k | £100.19k | £272.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.60k | £165.00k | £144.55k | £138.56k | £147.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £9.00k | £6.87k | £9.07k | N/A | £13.10k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £6.87k | £9.07k | £3.90k | £13.10k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 04 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 04 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 08 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 08 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 NOVEMBER 1974 as amended on 26 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF AND EDUCATION OF LOCAL HANDICAPPED CHILDREN BY THE PROVISION OF THERAPEUTIC EDUCATIONAL AND STIMULATING TOYS AND EQUIPTMENT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Lukes Hospital
Little Horton Lane
BRADFORD
West Yorkshire
BD5 0NA
- Phone:
- 01274365463
- Website:
-
WWW.BRADFORDINCLUSIVEDISABILITYSERVICE.CO.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window