Accounts and annual returns JOEY'S LEGACY BOXER RESCUE LIVERPOOL

Charity number: 1153964
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2018 30 April 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 30 April 2019 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2017 28 March 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 28 March 2018 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2016 14 November 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 07 March 2017 On Time