JAMIA MASJID HANFIA (BRADFORD) ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide islamic education to young children and old people.Provide feneral services
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
22 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bradford City
Governance
- 23 January 1975: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ABID HUSSAIN | Trustee | 08 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
HANIF MOHAMMED | Trustee | 08 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
IFRAZ AHMED | Trustee | 25 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
TANVIR HUSSAIN | Trustee | 25 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
BILAL KHAN | Trustee | 30 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
ZAFAR IQBAL | Trustee | 19 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
AMJAD Ali | Trustee | 19 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMAD YAQOOB | Trustee | 19 November 2011 |
|
|||||
MUNSIF DAD | Trustee | 19 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
MR MOHAMMAD ASLAM | Trustee | 19 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
SAKHAWAT HUSSAIN | Trustee | 19 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
SOOFI ALLAH DITTA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOHAMMAD ASHRAF BUTT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MAHBOOB HUSSAIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £143.82k | £127.73k | £193.85k | £210.24k | £157.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £205.77k | £160.48k | £192.34k | £155.29k | £153.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 01 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 01 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 30 April 2024 | 335 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 30 April 2024 | 335 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 02 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 02 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 01 October 2021 | 123 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 01 October 2021 | 123 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 11 May 2021 | 345 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 11 May 2021 | 345 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4 AUGUST 1974 AS AMENDED 1 JANUARY 1975 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF 19 MARCH 1985 AND SCHEME OF 26 NOVEMBER 1986.
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION AND ADVANCEMENT OF THE MUSLIM FAITH IN THE BRADFORD METROPOLITAN DISTRICT AREA.
Area of benefit
BRADFORD METROPOLITAN DISTRICT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
JAMIA MASJID HANFIA
CARLISLE ROAD
BD8 8AD
- Phone:
- 01274496565
- Email:
- hanfiamasjid@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window