Financial history SIKH HELPLINE

Charity number: 1154449
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £68.51k £163.67k £99.91k £106.59k £71.27k
Total expenditure £45.98k £67.98k £58.00k £74.25k £85.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £4.90k £26.35k N/A