BUDDHA METTA SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity arranges Buddhist pilgrimages primarily to Thailand but also elsewhere timed to coincide with the Far East cool season in January. We are led by Theravada Thai Forest Tradition monks, living in a simple way and sharing in the generosity we encounter as we visit and stay in many important sites to experience them and listen to Dhamma teachings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Thailand
Governance
- 28 November 2013: Standard registration
- 28 November 2018: Funds received from 1149071 BUDDHA METTA CAMBRIDGE
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KENNETH GARROD | Chair | 30 October 2013 |
|
|||||
MIRANDA SUSAN WALKER | Trustee | 22 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARJORIE JACK | Trustee | 30 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
ZARINE KATRAK | Trustee | 30 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
JEREMY MCLAREN BRUCE | Trustee | 30 October 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.12k | £17.50k | £28.46k | £52.29k | £20.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.12k | £17.50k | £27.34k | £51.63k | £20.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 November 2022 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 November 2022 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 SEP 2013
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE UNDERSTANDING OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN THE BUDDHIST RELIGION BY PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR THEM TO SPEND TIME WITH EXPERIENCED AND ORDAINED REPRESENTATIVES FROM THE THAI FOREST TRADITION MONASTIC SANGHA; BOTH HERE IN THE UK AND ON PILGRIMAGE. TO PROVIDE PILGRIMAGES TO SIGNIFICANT WORLD BUDDHIST SITES FOR ANYONE INTERESTED IN BUDDHISM, ACCOMPANIED BY EXPERIENCED GUIDES AND TEACHERS. SUPPORT THE WORK OF BUDDHIST MONK AJAHN SUDHIRO WHO HAS BEEN ORDAINED FOR OVER 28 YEARS IN THE THAI FOREST TRADITION TO TEACH AND HOST PILGRIMAGES. ALL DONATIONS MADE TO THE CHARITY WILL BE USED SOLELY TO SUPPORT THE ABOVE OBJECTS AND THE CHARITY WILL OPERATE AS A NON-PROFIT MAKING ORGANISATION WITH NO RETAINED CAPITAL. THERE WILL BE NO MEMBERSHIP FEE FOR PEOPLE WANTING TO BENEFIT FROM THE OBJECTS OF THIS CHARITY. TO PROVIDE INFORMATION TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC VIA AJAHN SUDHIRO?S RIGHT VIEW WEBSITE: HTTP://WWW.RIGHTVIEW.ORG/BUDDHAMETTA/BUDDHAMETTAUK.HTM ON THE CHARITY?S ACTIVITIES IN THE UK AND PERSONAL ACCOUNTS OF PILGRIMAGES COMPLETED AND PLANNED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 36
Ryland House
16-18 Edge Lane
MANCHESTER
M21 9JP
- Phone:
- 07977534606
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.