MI FLAMENCO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We bring all the benefits of the arts to as a diverse audience as possible. We do this through affordable high quality flamenco performances, which aim to educate and entertain. We deliver music, dance, cultural workshops for social, educational, cultural and health benefits to a wide range of people, focussing on the disadvantaged.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 September 2013: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karen Julie Butler | Trustee | 22 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
SARAH ELLIS | Trustee | 12 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
LORNA GLENWRIGHT | Trustee | 12 August 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £12.88k | £8.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £105 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £20.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2025 | 366 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2025 | 366 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 February 2023 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 February 2023 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 March 2022 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 March 2022 | 58 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 March 2021 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 03 March 2021 | 31 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 05 Sep 2013
Charitable objects
1.THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ARTS,CULTURE AND HERITAGE BY THE PERFORMANCE OF HIGH STANDARD MUSIC AND DANCE AND IN PARTICULAR FLAMENCO MUSIC AND DANCE 2.TO PROMOTE THE APPRECIATION OF AND ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE ARTS,IN PARTICULAR THE ART OF FLAMENCO MUSIC AND DANCE IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.3.TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF ACTIVITIES(IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FLAMENCO BASED)IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH,AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY,FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 FENTON ROAD
BOURNEMOUTH
BH6 5EY
- Phone:
- 07884014483
- Email:
- mi1flamenco@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window