Financial history THE FRIENDS OF GUISBOROUGH FOREST & WALKWAY

Charity number: 1154981
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £31.81k £1.59k £23.96k £23.38k £19.75k
Total expenditure £39.56k £6.05k £21.36k £18.99k £31.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A