Financial history NPT Transatlantic Limited

Charity number: 1153376
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £59.96m £61.13m £65.25m £87.55m £99.53m
Total expenditure £44.86m £33.68m £33.06m £70.79m £49.25m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £59.09m £60.46m £64.05m £84.42m £95.66m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £388.00k £162.51k £512.52k £2.31m £3.87m
Income - Other £483.66k £515.72k £685.66k £816.42k £1.81k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £44.28m £33.11m £32.16m £69.80m £48.16m
Expenditure - Raising funds £576.58k £571.05k £896.58k £985.27k £1.10m
Expenditure - Governance £54.79k £45.86k £2.00k £2.00k £64.28k
Expenditure - Grants institution £43.36m £32.12m £30.87m £68.25m £47.49m
Expenditure - Investment management £51.05k £74.83k £161.44k £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0