Accounts and annual returns BROWN BEARS COMMUNITY NURSERY

Charity number: 1154300
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 02 April 2016 26 January 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 02 April 2016 26 January 2017 On Time
Annual return 01 April 2015 14 September 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2015 14 September 2015 On Time