INTERNATIONAL WAQF FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising and distribution to charitable programmes
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£851,610
Donations and legacies | £851.61k | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£325,281
Raising funds | £195.58k | |
Charitable activities | £129.70k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £195.58k | |
Charitable expenditure | £129.70k | |
Retained for future use | £526.33k |
People

4 Employee(s)
4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England And Wales
- Afghanistan
- Albania
- Australia
- Bangladesh
- Belgium
- Bosnia And Herzegovina
- Chad
- China
- Eritrea
- Ethiopia
- Germany
- Haiti
- India
- Indonesia
- Iraq
- Ireland
- Italy
- Jordan
- Kenya
- Kosovo
- Malawi
- Malaysia
- Mauritius
- Netherlands
- Pakistan
- Russia
- Somalia
- South Africa
- Spain
- Sri Lanka
- Sudan
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- United States
- Yemen
Governance
- 23 July 2015: Standard registration
- ISLAMIC RELIEF WAQF (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Aqsa Noreen Aziz | Chair | 09 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Magdalena binti Samsuddin | Trustee | 09 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
ALIJA AVDUKIC | Trustee | 03 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Awadh S A Alasaime | Trustee | 15 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £698.30k | £730.35k | £761.75k | £1.03m | £851.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £325.05k | £400.88k | £365.89k | £369.23k | £325.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £698.30k | £730.35k | £761.75k | £1.03m | £851.61k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £295.50k | £323.45k | £332.83k | £372.30k | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £376.21k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £135.73k | £196.10k | £158.86k | £146.26k | £129.70k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £189.32k | £204.77k | £207.02k | £222.97k | £195.58k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £5.91k | £23.00k | £7.53k | £7.03k | £6.61k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £3.02k | £1.79k | £3.31k | £3.27k | £2.60k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £499.08k | £759.81k | £1.12m | £1.79m | £2.30m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £128.84k | £58.89k | £25.11k | £38.71k | £14.56k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 17 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16/07/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 21/07/2015 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 25 FEB 2019
Charitable objects
TAKING INTO ACCOUNT THE GENERAL PRINCIPLES OF WAQF AND THE ASPIRATION OF THE CHARITY, WHICH IS A PRACTICAL MANIFESTATION AND APPLICATION OF HUMANITARIAN VALUES, INSPIRED BY THE ISLAMIC FAITH, THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: 1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, BY MEANS INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO): (A) ESTABLISHING, OPERATING AND MAINTAINING SCHOOLS; (B) PROVIDING TRAINING, PROGRAMMES, COURSES, SEMINARS, CLASSES, WORKSHOPS, PERFORMANCES, SCHOLARSHIPS, BURSARIES, AWARDS, GRANTS, BOOKS, EQUIPMENT AND EDUCATIONAL AIDS; (C) ESTABLISHING, MAINTAINING AND OPERATING LIBRARIES; (D) ESTABLISHING, MAINTAINING AND OPERATING EDUCATIONAL TRAINING CENTRES; 2) THE RELIEF OR PREVENTION OF POVERTY, BY MEANS INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO): (A) THE PROVISION OF EMERGENCY ASSISTANCE TO ASSIST THOSE PEOPLE AFFECTED BY CONFLICT OR DISASTER; (B) THE PROVISIONS OF FOOD SUPPLIES; (C) THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL, TECHNICAL OR OTHER SUPPORT FOR SMALL BUSINESS AND ENTERPRISE DEVELOPMENT, WHICH ARE OWNED BY AND/OR PRIMARILY EMPLOY POOR PERSONS, ENABLING THEM TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT; (D) INITIATIVES TO ADDRESS UNEMPLOYMENT; 3) THE PROMOTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND WELL-BEING AND THE PREVENTION AND TREATMENT OF DISEASE, BY MEANS INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO): (A) THE PROVISION OF SAFE AND ACCESSIBLE WATER SUPPLIES AND IMPROVED SANITATION; AND (B) THE RELIEF, CARE AND WELFARE OF CHILDREN AND IN PARTICULAR ORPHAN CHILDREN. 4) THE ADVANCEMENT OF SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT, BY MEANS INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO): (A) THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION AND THE PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND THE PRUDENT USE OF RESOURCES; (B) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES; (C) THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHIEVING ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION; (SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT MEANS “DEVELOPMENT WHICH MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS.”) 5) THE PROMOTION OF THIRD SECTOR ORGANISATIONS AND THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF THIRD SECTOR ORGANISATIONS; (“THIRD SECTOR ORGANISATIONS” MEANS CHARITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND OTHER FORMS OF SOCIAL ENTERPRISES ESTABLISHED FOR PUBLIC AND COMMUNITY BENEFIT). FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE, CHARITIES ARE ORGANISATIONS WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS INTERPRETED IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES. VOLUNTARY AND NOT FOR PROFIT ORGANISATIONS ARE INDEPENDENT ORGANISATIONS WHICH ADD VALUE TO THE COMMUNITY AS A WHOLE, OR A SIGNIFICANT SECTION OF THE COMMUNITY. VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS DO NOT INCLUDE LOCAL GOVERNMENT OR OTHER STATUTORY AUTHORITIES. 6) THE ADVANCEMENT OF SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE IN ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE IN THEIR SOLE DISCRETION. PROVIDED THAT THE CHARITY MAY NOT FURTHER ANY PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAWS OF SCOTLAND OR NORTHERN IRELAND.
Contact information
- Address:
-
22-24 Sampson Road North
Birmingham
- Phone:
- 01216220716
- Email:
- Waqf@waqf.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window