UMMA FUNERAL SERVICES IN THE MIDLANDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Funeral Services
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Birmingham City
- Solihull
- Walsall
- Warwickshire
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 06 August 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ABDI AAFI | Chair | 20 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Abdullahi Faluk | Trustee | 16 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
MR CALI HAAJI | Trustee | 20 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
ALI AHMED MOHAMED | Trustee | 20 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
ABDI ALI DHUHUL | Trustee | 20 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
FAARAH ABDULKADIR | Trustee | 20 September 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.99k | £62.26k | £71.62k | £5.72k | £15.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.04k | £39.82k | £30.92k | £6.74k | £13.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 07 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 05 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 05 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 04 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 04 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 01 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 01 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 01/08/2014
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE MUSLIM FAITH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNERAL AND BURIAL SERVICES AND COUNSELLING SUPPORT FOR THE BEREAVED
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 WHITMORE ROAD
BIRMINGHAM
B10 0NP
- Phone:
- 07957977416
- Email:
- info@ummafuneral.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window