THE AMADE PLAYERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the public appreciation of, and to educate the public in the subject of historical music and the allied arts, particularly people under the age of 20, and those living or studying in disadvantaged areas. This work mainly takes place in central and south east London.
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- City Of Westminster
- Greenwich
- Lewisham
- Southwark
Governance
- 13 November 2013: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NICHOLAS NEWLAND MA | Chair | 29 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLA ENDERBY BMUS, MMUS | Trustee | 29 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA ISABEL COLLINS BA MSc | Trustee | 29 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
REBECCA RAMSEY BA, MMUS | Trustee | 29 August 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 112 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 112 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 478 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 478 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 843 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 843 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1208 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1208 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1573 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1573 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 13 Nov 2013
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE PUBLIC APPRECIATION OF, AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE ART OF HISTORICAL MUSIC AND THE ALLIED ARTS, PARTICULARLY PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 20, AND THOSE LIVING OR STUDYING IN DISADVANTAGED AREAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
39 ELCOT AVENUE
LONDON
SE15 1QB
- Phone:
- 07843206693
- Email:
- music@amadeplayers.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window