CANALSIDE HERITAGE CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A heritage centre in renovated lock cottages next to Beeston Weir and The River Trent depicting life on the waterways and the history of the Beeston Cut. There is also a small gift shop, tea rooms and community garden with allotment plots which are to be used by local schools and beehives. Open all year round 7 days a week.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 24 February 2014: Standard registration
- 31 August 2021: Funds received from 1122039 VOLUNTARY ACTION BROXTOWE
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEWART CRAVEN LIOB | Chair | 07 October 2013 |
|
|||||
Iain Paterson-Stephens | Trustee | 11 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
KATE FOALE | Trustee | 15 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Dodd | Trustee | 26 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
JODIE SCADDAN LLB | Trustee | 07 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
JULIAN OWEN MBE | Trustee | 07 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM MORLEY HOPCROFT MMS | Trustee | 07 October 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £124.15k | £263.53k | £96.57k | £61.92k | £112.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £122.33k | £112.83k | £136.62k | £161.14k | £191.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03 FEB 2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 21/02/2014
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE PRESERVATION OF HISTORICAL HERITAGE BY THE CONSTRUCTION, MANAGEMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF A HERITAGE MUSEUM, RESOURCE CENTRE AND EXHIBITION GALLERY IN BEESTON NOTTINGHAM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lock Cottages
Canal Side
Beeston
NOTTINGHAM
NG91LZ
- Phone:
- 01159221773
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window