CLEAN SHEET

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Clean Sheet is a Christian charity supporting former prisoners into sustainable employment, education or training to help break the cycle of re-offending. Sustainable employment provides dignity and resources for independent living which changes lives for good.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £1,800 from 1 government contract(s) and £34,980 from 4 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 01 October 2013: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amanda Coyle | Chair | 19 November 2021 |
|
|||||||||
Andrew Newell | Trustee | 07 February 2025 |
|
|||||||||
Simon May | Trustee | 07 February 2025 |
|
|
||||||||
Stephen Lawes | Trustee | 26 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
ROBERT CHARLES PATRICK GWYNN | Trustee | 12 May 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £257.52k | £279.82k | £239.33k | £99.27k | £282.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £195.95k | £233.62k | £231.63k | £244.04k | £251.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £23.64k | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.80k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £43.00k | £34.98k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 01 Oct 2013
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES SET OUT IN THE STATEMENT OF FAITH, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT:- 4.1 TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION TO PREVENT IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) PRISONERS AND EX-OFFENDERS FROM BEING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY; AND 4.2 TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PRISONERS AND EX-OFFENDERS WHO AS A RESULT OF IMPRISONMENT ARE SUFFERING THE EFFECTS OF UNEMPLOYMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, ILL HEALTH AND DISABILITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Clean Sheet c/o Caladine Ltd
22 Upperton Road
EASTBOURNE
East Sussex
BN21 1BF
- Phone:
- 0300 123 3045
- Email:
- info@cleansheet.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window