WALKING WITH THE WOUNDED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide resettlement assistance and relief of financial and other charitable need for personnel who are leaving or have left the armed forces, in particular but not exclusively those who have been wounded whilst serving, by providing funding for education and training to assist them in finding work and jobs and to attain the skills required to obtain and retain work outside the armed forces.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£5,743,617
Donations and legacies | £2.18m | |
Charitable activities | £2.84m | |
Other trading activities | £10.00k | |
Investments | £139.52k | |
Other | £571.67k |
Total expenditure:
£5,253,350
Raising funds | £1.28m | |
Charitable activities | £3.98m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.28m | |
Charitable expenditure | £3.98m | |
Retained for future use | £490.27k |
People

83 Employee(s)
12 Trustee(s)
43 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 2 |
£70k to £80k | 2 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Recreation
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- WWTW (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DICK TURPIN | Chair | 19 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
Alverne Bolitho | Trustee | 06 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Gregg Stevenson MBE | Trustee | 06 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alan Finnegan | Trustee | 16 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adam Hughes | Trustee | 04 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Anthony Edward Nanson | Trustee | 08 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Luke D'Arcy | Trustee | 11 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Louise Campbell | Trustee | 11 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan Walton | Trustee | 05 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Damian Beeley | Trustee | 07 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Flora Joyce McLean | Trustee | 03 March 2015 |
|
|||||
James Alistair Hibbert | Trustee | 03 March 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.49m | £4.20m | £5.05m | £5.65m | £5.74m | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.59m | £3.69m | £4.01m | £4.89m | £5.25m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £664.80k | £1.82m | £2.10m | £2.63m | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £499.00k | £200.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.76m | £1.85m | £2.12m | £2.60m | £2.18m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £436.36k | £529.66k | £828.57k | £391.58k | £10.00k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.29m | £1.82m | £2.10m | £2.63m | £2.84m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.93k | £2.77k | £207 | £32.55k | £139.52k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £571.67k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £3.45k | £73.45k | £20.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.86m | £2.85m | £3.05m | £3.92m | £3.98m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £670.19k | £729.93k | £864.06k | £972.80k | £1.28m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £0 | £18.62k | £22.63k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £58.40k | £115.56k | £97.69k | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £30.83k | £16.91k | £5.28k | £1 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £931.21k | £1.91m | £2.62m | £3.87m | £3.95m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £775.94k | £1.24m | £897.11k | £1.39m | £973.24k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 16 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17/07/2013 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 08/08/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 08 OCT 2016
Charitable objects
3.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: 3.1.1 TO PROVIDE RESETTLEMENT ASSISTANCE AND RELIEF OF FINANCIAL AND OTHER CHARITABLE NEED FOR PERSONNEL WHO ARE LEAVING OR HAVE LEFT THE ARMED FORCES, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THOSE WHO HAVE BEEN WOUNDED WHILST SERVING, INCLUDING BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION, BY PROVIDING FUNDING FOR EDUCATION AND TRAINING TO ASSIST THEM IN FINDING WORK AND JOBS AND TO ATTAIN THE SKILLS REQUIRED TO OBTAIN AND RETAIN WORK OUTSIDE THE ARMED FORCES. 3.1.2 TO PROVIDE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL AND OTHER CHARITABLE NEED FOR THE DEPENDANTS OF SUCH PERSONS. 3.1.3 THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION OF CURRENT AND FORMER SERVICE PERSONNEL, IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION OF THE UK, WHO ARE EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY OR PARTS OF SOCIETY AS A RESULT OF BEING WOUNDED WHILST SERVING, IN PARTICULAR BY: (A) PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND RAISING AWARENESS OF I) THEIR CAPABILITIES NOTWITHSTANDING THEIR INJURIES AND II) THE SPECIAL HEALTH, FINANCIAL, EDUCATIONAL, SOCIAL AND EMPLOYMENT PROBLEMS FACED BY THEM; AND (B) PROVIDING THEM WITH OPPORTUNITIES TO BUILD CAPACITY BY PARTICIPATING IN EXPEDITIONS AND OTHER ACTIVITIES TO RELIEVE THEIR NEEDS AND TO ASSIST THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
42 Canada Street
MANCHESTER
M40 8AE
- Phone:
- 033 00 585 800
- Email:
- info@wwtw.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window