HOME-START HERTFORDSHIRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Home-Start Hertfordshire is a charity that supports families throughout Hertfordshire and covers the boroughs of Broxbourne, Dacorum, East Hertfordshire, North Hertfordshire (excluding Royston), Stevenage, St Albans and Welwyn Hatfield. Home-Start Schemes offer support, friendship and practical help to parents with young children in local communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £35,364 from 7 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
119 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hertfordshire
Governance
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julia Gregory | Chair | 13 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Zoe-Louise Wright | Trustee | 18 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Morta Tyree | Trustee | 27 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Peter Earnshaw | Trustee | 05 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Reuben Mallinson Taylor KC | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Peter Humble | Trustee | 15 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Joanne Morgan | Trustee | 23 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Gould | Trustee | 16 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sian Whittaker | Trustee | 16 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gail Christey | Trustee | 16 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Wilson | Trustee | 30 July 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £363.55k | £360.11k | £338.02k | £351.57k | £419.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £291.79k | £278.94k | £351.41k | £376.78k | £500.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £39.38k | £56.77k | £102.33k | £51.38k | £35.36k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21 NOV 2012 as amended on 09 Dec 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: A TO SAFEGUARD, PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE GOOD HEALTH, BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL OF CHILDREN AND PARENTS OF CHILDREN; B TO PREVENT CRUELTY TO OR MALTREATMENT OF CHILDREN; C TO RELIEVE SICKNESS, POVERTY AND NEED AMONGST CHILDREN AND PARENTS OF CHILDREN; D TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN BETTER STANDARDS OF CHILD CARE WITHIN THE AREA OF HERTFORDSHIRE AND ITS ENVIRONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Home Start
4-5 Bedwell Park
Stevenage
SG1 1NB
- Phone:
- 01438367788
- Email:
- admin@home-startherts.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window