GURU NANAK SIKH GURDWARA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide a place of worship and education
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
19 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Telford & Wrekin
Governance
- 11 February 1975: Standard registration
- GURU NANAK SIKH TEMPLE (Previous name)
- Paying staff
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harpreet Singh Varanitch | Trustee | 03 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Joga Singh Sidhu | Trustee | 03 June 2023 |
|
|||||
SUCHA SINGH KHAIRA | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
JARNAIL SINGH SIDHU | Trustee | 21 December 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £92.17k | £49.79k | £80.96k | £97.17k | £101.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £79.97k | £50.15k | £68.25k | £86.31k | £103.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADPOTED 23 DECEMBER 1974 AS AMENDED 21 FEBRUARY 1988 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 24 FEB 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE SIKH RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHING OF SIRI GURU GRANTH SAHIB JI AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND RELIGION OF HIS FOLLOWERS. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 2 OF ABOVE CONSTITUTION).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Hadley Park Road
Leegomery
Telford
TF1 6PW
- Phone:
- 01952411730
- Email:
- HADLEYGNG@OUTLOOK.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window