CHAUCER FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE CHARITY IS A CORPORATE FOUNDATION OF CHAUCER SYNDICATES LIMITED (CSL). IT IS PRIMARILY A GRANT GIVING ORGANISATION WHICH MAKES DONATIONS TO CHARITIES WHICH ARE EITHER ACTIVE IN COMMUNITIES LOCAL TO CSL OR HAVE SOME RELEVANCE TO THE INSURANCE SECTOR. THE CHARITY ALSO PROVIDES SUPPORT TO OTHER LOCAL CHARITIES AND COMMUNITIES, SUCH AS PROCURING VOLUNTEER SUPPORT FROM CSL.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 15 August 2013: Standard registration
- 18 October 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £218.61k | £136.48k | £393.58k | £176.68k | £3.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £63.11k | £172.98k | £365.51k | £124.20k | £212.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 11 September 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 10 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | 10 October 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 28 October 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | 25 October 2016 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21/06/2013
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO PROMOTE ANY PURPOSE THAT IS CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO ENGLISH LAW.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window