PORTCHESTER & DISTRICT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides/enables community-run facilities, activities, services including (but not restricted to): sports, arts, crafts, older person's clubs, toy library, Pre-School, volunteering, services to children's centres/libraries; adult/community learning; Portchester Gala; community events, volunteering/work placements, second-hand bookshop, information centre, copying, Internet cafe
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £32,600 from 3 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hampshire
- Portsmouth City
Governance
- 11 November 2013: CIO registration
- 29 June 2015: Funds received from 301920 PORTCHESTER AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
- PCA (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jodie Downes | Trustee | 02 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Walter | Trustee | 08 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carole Bailey | Trustee | 07 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Frances Mac Enri | Trustee | 10 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Debra Lowrey | Trustee | 27 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Trudy Barbara Pryce Bishop | Trustee | 27 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Gillmore | Trustee | 19 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA WAYMAN | Trustee | 26 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Hall | Trustee | 06 September 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £169.74k | £185.61k | £202.25k | £209.40k | £176.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £145.76k | £141.48k | £207.14k | £200.14k | £184.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £920 | £128.79k | £132.83k | £119.39k | £32.60k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 10 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 11 Nov 2013
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 3.1 TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; 3.2 TO ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF, A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND/OR OTHER COMMUNITY PREMISES, AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTS; 3.3 TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED. THE CHARITY SHALL BE NON-PARTY IN POLITICS AND NON-SECTARIAN IN RELIGION. THE AREA OF BENEFIT (AREA OF BENEFIT) SHALL BE (PORTCHESTER) AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOODS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 NEW PARADE 38 WEST STREET
PORTCHESTER
FAREHAM
HAMPSHIRE
PO16 9UY
- Phone:
- 02392210048
- Email:
- manager@portchesterca.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window