Healthier Heroes Foundation

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supports Armed Forces Veterans and their families with a variety of issues: homelessness, metal & physical health, employment, benefits, pensions, debt management, isolation, veterans'. Provides a 'sign-posting' service and funding to support organisations to achieve common Charitable aims.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Blackburn With Darwen
- Blackpool
- Cumbria
- Lancashire
Governance
- 18 October 2013: Standard registration
- AFGP (Working name)
- AFG (Previous name)
- AFG P (Previous name)
- ARMED FORCES GROUP (Previous name)
- ARMED FORCES GROUP PRESTON (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew James Powell | Chair | 16 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
SARAH THOMSON | Trustee | 10 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Edward Alexander Fraser | Trustee | 16 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lee James Griffiths | Trustee | 16 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Garth Lighten | Trustee | 16 February 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £865 | £0 | £998 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.57k | £588 | £2.08k | £469 | £1.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 February 2025 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 February 2023 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 May 2022 | 98 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 April 2022 | 452 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 JUL 2013 AS AMENDED ON 14/10/2013 as amended on 23 Oct 2024 as amended on 04 Mar 2025
Charitable objects
Aims of the Group. In accordance with the Armed Forces Covenant, the Aims of the Group shall be to relieve need, hardship and distress amongst the members and former members of all branches of the armed forces and their families, in particular but not exclusively through: a.the provision of advice and information to Local and National Government agencies on matters affecting members of the armed forces; b.the provision of information and advice on issues concerning them such as welfare, housing, benefits and pensions; c. liaising with individual veterans and veteran organisations as appropriate and provide funding to those organisations that achieve the Charity’s aims and objectives.
Contact information
- Address:
-
17-19 Nicholas Street
BURNLEY
Lancashire
BB11 2AQ
- Phone:
- 01282966730
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window