ETUDEO HOLISTIC LEARNING CENTRE LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide holistic learning services in a safe environment with measurable progression monitors for all, to marginalised groups, in particular the learning disable and deprived
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- East Sussex
- West Sussex
Governance
- 13 December 2013: Standard registration
- 01 March 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- ETUDEO (Working name)
- ?TUDEO (Previous name)
- ETUDEO (Previous name)
- ETUDEO (Previous name)
- ETUDEO (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2014 | 30/09/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £53.17k | £21.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £62.90k | £38.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2018 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20/09/2011
Charitable objects
4. THE CHARITY?S OBJECT (?OBJECT?) IS SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND A LOVE OF LEARNING BY: (A) PROVIDING CLASSES IN A VARIETY OF SUBJECTS, FOR STUDENTS FROM THE AGE OF 2 TO 18, IN A HOLISTIC LEARNING ENVIRONMENT. (B) CREATING A NURTURING ATMOSPHERE OF PEACE, BEAUTY, AND SAFETY CONDUCIVE TO THE BEST POSSIBLE LEARNING FOR BOTH STUDENT AND TUTOR. (C) NURTURING CONFIDENCE AND ENCOURAGING ENTHUSED CURIOSITY BY PROVIDING PASSIONATE HIGH-QUALITY TUTORS IN LOW TUTOR-STUDENT RATIO GROUPS. (D) TAILORING CLASSES TO INDIVIDUAL NEEDS, IN ORDER TO FACILITATE EQUAL LEARNING OPPORTUNITY. (E) ENSURING ACCESSIBILITY OF CLASSES TO STUDENTS; ASSURING FINANCIAL CAPABILITY DOES NOT INHIBIT PARTICIPATION BY GRANTING BURSARIES IN APPROPRIATE CASES. (F) FUNDRAISING, WITH THE HELP OF PARENTS AND VOLUNTEERS, FOR THE CONTINUED ETHOS AND EVOLUTION OF ?TUDEO.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window