Trustees DERBYSHIRE HISTORIC BUILDINGS TRUST
Charity number: 503983

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Derek James Latham | Chair | 26 July 2017 |
|
|||||
Mark Somerfield | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rodney Muir | Trustee | 19 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elisabeth Claire Stoppard | Trustee | 27 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
PETER HERBERT MILNER | Trustee | 26 July 2017 |
|
|||||
Dr Ian Webster | Trustee | 26 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
ALLAN BAXTER MORRISON | Trustee | 16 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
BARRY RICHARD JOYCE MBE | Trustee | 16 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
OLIVER BOSTOCK GERRISH | Trustee | 30 September 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.