Financial history WADHURST CULTURE

Charity number: 1154252
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022
Total gross income £4.86k £19.54k £3.49k £3.29k £1.83k
Total expenditure £5.95k £13.14k £15.12k £2.29k £2.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.00k £1.80k N/A £1.15k £500