RCCG ROCK OF REDEMPTION (APATA IRAPADA)

Charity Number: 1154952
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

THE ADVANCEMENT OF CHRISTAIN FAITH WORLDWIDE HELPING TO BUILD THE HOPE OF OUR CHILDREN TO BRING HOPE TO ELDERLY AND YOUNG PEOPLE. TO ASSIST IN THE RELIEF OF HUMAN SUFFERING AND POVERTY.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £46,814
Total expenditure: £95,613

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • City Of London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 December 2013: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOSEPH OLU AKINYEMI Trustee 01 December 2019
None on record
IBUKUN BABATUNDE Trustee 12 August 2013
None on record
GBOLHAN ADEDOYIN Trustee 12 August 2013
None on record
OLAKUNLE ADEOYE Trustee 12 August 2013
None on record
MUTIAT OLADIMEJI KUKU Trustee 12 August 2013
None on record
PHILIP KING-YOMBO Trustee 13 June 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £111.06k £77.05k £100.75k £76.56k £46.81k
Total expenditure £127.64k £74.55k £101.39k £79.14k £95.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 14 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 14 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 03 May 2024 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 03 May 2024 3 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 30 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 30 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 25 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 25 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 14 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 14 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
37-39
Peckham High Street
London
London
SE15 5EB
Phone:
07960536201
Website:

No information available