GENESIS TRUST BATH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE GENESIS TRUST OPERATES WITHIN THE CITY OF BATH PROVIDING SERVICES TO THOSE IN NEED; PARTICULARLY THE HOMELESS AND VULNERABLY HOUSED. ITS ACTIVITIES INCLUDE THE PROVISION OF MEALS, HOUSEHOLD ITEMS (FURNITURE), ADVICE AND SIGNPOSTING, LIFESKILLS ACTIVITIES AND WORK PLACEMENTS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£1,170,916
Donations and legacies | £925.50k | |
Charitable activities | £20.79k | |
Other trading activities | £220.25k | |
Investments | £4.38k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,264,445
Raising funds | £490.87k | |
Charitable activities | £773.57k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £490.87k | |
Charitable expenditure | £773.57k |
People

24 Employee(s)
6 Trustee(s)
160 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bath And North East Somerset
Governance
- 17 October 2013: Standard registration
- 13 April 2019: Funds received from 1157851 SNOW HILL GATEWAY TRUST
- Genesis Trust (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Eurtrice Horwood | Chair | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
John Colvin | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alastair Gibson | Trustee | 14 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Eduard Spruit | Trustee | 08 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Ruth Lewis | Trustee | 06 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Heywood | Trustee | 08 August 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £687.30k | £908.46k | £679.20k | £1.03m | £1.17m | |
|
Total expenditure | £714.84k | £703.69k | £774.35k | £994.57k | £1.26m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £8.47k | £49.69k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £520.70k | £879.99k | £571.47k | £853.60k | £925.50k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £2.51k | £107.65k | £147.77k | £220.25k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £164.30k | £25.75k | £0 | £23.68k | £20.79k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £210 | £211 | £30 | £795 | £4.38k | |
|
Income - Other | £2.09k | £0 | £45 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £47.83k | £1.49k | £10.41k | £9.77k | £100 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £618.69k | £611.40k | £522.30k | £630.31k | £773.57k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £96.15k | £92.29k | £123.69k | £171.25k | £490.87k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £5.22k | £0 | £0 | £7.33k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £128.35k | £193.01k | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £175.15k | £159.93k | £157.87k | £138.77k | £123.54k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £366.21k | £581.29k | £493.22k | £568.70k | £483.36k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £15.17k | £10.26k | £15.28k | £40.39k | £33.35k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15 JUL 2013
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT:- 3.1. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONGST HOMELESS AND DESTITUTE PERSONS AND THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS OF PEOPLE IN NEED IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) THOSE LIVING IN BATH AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS; AND 3.2. TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT LIMITED) TO THOSE LIVING IN BATH AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS. FOR THE PURPOSE OF ARTICLE 3.2 "SOCIALLY EXCLUDED" MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OF MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS; DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX, RACE, DISABILITY, ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF, CREED, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER RE-ASSIGNMENT; POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN; POOR HOUSING (THAT IS HOUSING THAT DOES NOT MEET BASIC HABITABLE STANDARDS; CRIME (EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY).
Area of benefit
IN BATH AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 10A
Church Farm Business Park
Corston
BATH
BA2 9AP
- Phone:
- 01225463549
- Email:
- office@genesistrust.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window