STAND ALONE CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Stand Alone supports adults that are estranged from their family or key family member. We run support groups, training and facilitate research on family estrangement and its effects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
Governance
- 22 November 2013: CIO registration
- STAND ALONE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Elizabeth Eunice Watts-Cobbe | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin John Jordan | Trustee | 15 August 2022 |
|
|||||
Geraldine McAndrew OBE | Trustee | 20 June 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £196.72k | £211.33k | £159.14k | £21.17k | £15.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £158.86k | £147.45k | £132.10k | £163.90k | £119.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 02 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 02 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 02 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 04 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 22 Nov 2013
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE WHO ARE ESTRANGED FROM THEIR FAMILY OR MEMBERS OF THEIR FAMILY FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’ MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF FAMILY RELATIONSHIP BREAKDOWN. 2) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AMONG THE PUBLIC ON THE SUBJECT OF FAMILY ESTRANGEMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
34B
York Way
N1 9AB
- Phone:
- 020 7841 3450
- Email:
- contact@standalone.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window