Financial history BEDALE SCOUTS

Charity number: 503989
Charity reporting is up to date (83 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £21.48k £21.62k £25.90k £19.28k £30.42k
Total expenditure £14.39k £10.73k £14.50k £19.25k £20.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A