FRESH START SUPPORTED HOUSING LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Barking And Dagenham
- Essex
Governance
- 11 March 2014: Standard registration
- 09 December 2016: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2015 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14/06/2013 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 29/07/2013
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ('OBJECTS') ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING:- THE RELIEF OF POVERTY HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF ACCOMMODATION, SUPPORT, TRAINING AND COUNSELLING FOR VULNERABLE PEOPLE WHO ARE HOMELESS OR IN ACUTE HOUSING DISTRESS AND SUFFERING POVERTY HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS IN THE EAST END OF LONDON.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window