R.E.S.T FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The R.E.S.T Foundation was set up in 2012 to support those left behind after loosing a loved ones to suicide
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Blackpool
Governance
- 02 September 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Toni Louise Chadwick | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
benjamin WILLIAMSON | Trustee | 19 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
JADE MARIE WILLIAMSON | Trustee | 06 August 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £1.00k | £2.00k | £10.00k | £10.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £1.00k | £2.00k | £10.00k | £10.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 12 July 2024 | 158 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 07 April 2022 | 61 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 30 March 2021 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26/10/2012
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION FOR THE BENEFIT OF RESIDENTS OF BLACKPOOL AND SURROUNDING AREAS OF ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE DIRECTED TO SUPPORTING THOSE WHO HAVE LOST THROUGH SUICIDE A RELATIVE OR FRIEND AND IN PARTICULAR THE PROTECTION AND PROMOTION OF THEIR GOOD HEALTH BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL THROUGH THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN MATTERS RELATING TO THE SOCIAL CAUSES OF SUICIDE AND THE NATURE OF GRIEVING AND BEREAVEMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Lostock Gardens
Blackpool
FY4 3PP
- Phone:
- 01253 343641
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window