JOSEPH GEORGE FUCILE FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Help relieve the needs of disabled children in Sunderland and surrounding areas
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 02 January 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sunderland
Governance
- 16 September 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DARREN FUCILE | Chair | 21 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
JANINE FUCILE | Trustee | 21 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA FUCILE | Trustee | 21 August 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 02/01/2020 | 02/01/2021 | 02/01/2022 | 02/01/2023 | 02/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.63k | £3.06k | £1.91k | £4.42k | £3.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.96k | £48 | £48 | £5.29k | £2.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 02 January 2024 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 02 January 2023 | 02 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 02 January 2022 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 02 January 2021 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 02 January 2020 | 09 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 02 JAN 2013 AS AMENDED ON 13/09/2013
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF DISABLED CHILDREN IN SUNDERLAND AND THE SURROUNDING AREA AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 The Granaries
Offerton
SUNDERLAND
SR4 9JL
- Phone:
- 01915420334
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window