Accounts and annual returns COMMUNITY REACH

Charity number: 1153409
Charity reporting is overdue by 1380 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 284 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 284 days
Annual return 30 September 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 650 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 650 days
Annual return 30 September 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1015 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1015 days
Annual return 30 September 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1380 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1380 days
Annual return 30 September 2019 30 October 2020 92 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 30 October 2020 92 days late Download Open in new window