SOLENT STUDENTS' UNION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE UNION'S OBJECTS ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF STUDENTS AT SOUTHAMPTON SOLENT UNIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: PROMOTING THEIR INTERESTS AND WELFARE, PROVIDING REPRESENTATION, ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE, PROVIDING SOCIAL, CULTURAL, SPORTING AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES, PROVIDING FORUMS FOR DISCUSSION AND DEBATE FOR THEIR PERSONAL BENEFIT
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income:
£690,296
Donations and legacies | £607.82k | |
Charitable activities | £18.97k | |
Other trading activities | £58.25k | |
Investments | £5.26k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£727,734
Raising funds | £111.51k | |
Charitable activities | £616.23k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £111.51k | |
Charitable expenditure | £616.23k |
People

15 Employee(s)
9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hampshire
Governance
- 12 August 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philip James Kloppenborg | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mohandas Jeyakumar | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Feist | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Syed Hossain | Trustee | 17 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Chinmaykumar Darji | Trustee | 17 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sanidhya Shetty | Trustee | 17 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Noah Forde | Trustee | 09 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mihaela Spirova | Trustee | 15 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen John Carter | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £674.12k | £597.23k | £660.24k | £628.55k | £690.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £651.52k | £516.90k | £608.34k | £695.82k | £727.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £7.00k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £577.14k | £554.85k | £596.95k | £574.75k | £607.82k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £88.40k | £39.82k | £53.85k | £46.70k | £58.25k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £7.30k | £1.43k | £5.56k | £4.26k | £18.97k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.28k | £1.14k | £375 | £2.85k | £5.26k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £3.51k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £576.83k | £465.33k | £561.88k | £582.09k | £616.23k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £74.69k | £51.56k | £46.47k | £113.74k | £111.51k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £13.14k | £9.81k | £10.65k | £11.07k | £143.64k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £2.09k | £683 | £1.56k | £13.50k | £27.41k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £1 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £640.71k | £684.58k | £686.98k | £623.27k | £572.98k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£359.53k | -£334.56k | -£297.47k | -£371.19k | -£352.24k | |
|
Total liabilities | £78.47k | £65.56k | £54.02k | £53.88k | £73.88k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 29 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 29 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 23 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 23 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22/07/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/12/2013 as amended on 12 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
THE UNIONS OBJECTS ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF STUDENTS AT SOUTHAMPTON SOLENT UNIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: - PROMOTING THE INTERESTS AND WELFARE OF STUDENTS AT SOUTHAMPTON SOLENT UNIVERSITY DURING THEIR COURSE OF STUDY; - PROVIDING REPRESENTATION, ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE TO STUDENTS ON MATTERS AFFECTING THEIR WELFARE AND INTERESTS AS STUDENTS; - PROVIDING SOCIAL, CULTURAL, SPORTING AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND FORUMS FOR DISCUSSIONS AND DEBATE FOR THE PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT OF ITS STUDENTS; - BEING THE RECOGNISED REPRESENTATIVE CHANNEL BETWEEN STUDENTS AND SOUTHAMPTON SOLENT UNIVERSITY AND ANY OTHER EXTERNAL BODIES; AND - PROMOTING AND ENCOURAGING CONTACT AND COOPERATION BETWEEN STUDENTS IN ALL MATTERS AFFECTING THEIR INTERESTS AS STUDENTS WITHOUT REGARD TO ETHNIC ORIGIN, NATIONALITY, GENDER, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RELIGION, DISABILITY OR AGE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SOLENT STUDENTS' UNION
EAST PARK TERRACE
SOUTHAMPTON
SO14 0YN
- Phone:
- 02380319873
- Email:
- SUPRESIDENT@SOLENT.AC.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window