HOMEWARD BOUND DOG RESCUE UK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the last 18 months we have not been fundraising as much and have only brought a few dogs over from Romania and helped the rescue dogs in this country and Romania. For the money left in our account we are sending the money to a resuer in Romania to help vaccinate and provide food for the public shelter dogs. On the 19th Jan our bank account will close and we will be closing down our charity
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- City Of London
- Oxfordshire
- Surrey
- Romania
Governance
- 04 November 2013: Standard registration
- 13 February 2017: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2015 | 05/04/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £120 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £800 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2016 | 26 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2015 | 13 January 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 JUL 2013 AS AMENDED ON 16/10/2013
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF ANIMALS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND TO PROVIDE HOMES OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH ANIMALS AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO ANIMAL WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY TO DOGS IN ROMANIA.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window