THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BURY ROCH VALLEY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The PCC?s charitable objects are Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church. This equates to the advancement of religion, which is recognised as a charitable purpose having public benefit. All regular public worship is provided free of charge and open to all.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £650 from 1 government grant(s)
People

21 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bury
Governance
- 17 September 2013: Previously excepted registration
- ROCH VALLEY BURY PCC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
21 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Simon Watkinson | Chair | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Smith | Trustee | 24 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Smith | Trustee | 24 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Jason Lawton | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Keith Watkinson | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Douglas | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Curry | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Whitbread | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Annum Shafique | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alan Brady | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Khan | Trustee | 10 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Heath | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Julie McGloughlin | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Peter Robinson | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Grosvenor | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Paula Heap | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jill Brady | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
PAULINE DICKINSON | Trustee | 05 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA IKIN | Trustee | 05 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
YVONNE GRIFFITHS | Trustee | 05 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN KIRKBY | Trustee | 05 September 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £252.32k | £50.65k | £100.16k | £73.28k | £109.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £90.41k | £73.26k | £64.99k | £96.48k | £104.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £650 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 14 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 01 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 10 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Peters Church
St. Peters Road
BURY
Lancashire
BL9 9QZ
- Phone:
- 0161 641 1277
- Email:
- hello@stpetersbury.church
- Website:
-
stpetersbury.church
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window