UCKFIELD FOODBANK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
With the support of the Churches in Uckfield, in particular but not exclusively by providing emergency food boxes containing three days supply of balanced and nutritional foodstuffs to individuals in need and/or for distribution by charities or other organisations working to prevent or relieve poverty and the provision of or signposting to relevant information and other advisory services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £30,003 from 4 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
64 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- East Sussex
Governance
- 22 August 2013: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER ROE | Chair | 04 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
Kelvin John Williams | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alyson Daphne Johnson | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Kingston Burt | Trustee | 13 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP GARLAND | Trustee | 04 August 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.41k | £46.14k | £29.44k | £53.49k | £79.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.50k | £27.96k | £36.21k | £49.94k | £72.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £9.56k | £7.91k | £10.58k | £30.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 01 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 23 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 22 Aug 2013
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN UCKFIELD AND SURROUNDING AREAS,WITH THE SUPPORT OF THE CHURCHES IN UCKFIELD,IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY:A)PROVIDING EMERGENCY FOOD BOXES CONTAINING THREE DAYS SUPPLY OF BALANCED AND NUTRITIONAL FOODSTUFFS TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR FOR DISTRIBUTION BY CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY;B)THE PROVISION OF OR SIGNPOSTING TO RELEVANT INFORMATION AND OTHER ADVISORY SERVICES
Contact information
- Address:
-
Uckfield Foodbank
15 Horsted Square
Bellbrook Industrial Estate
Uckfield
TN22 1QG
- Phone:
- 01825745489
- Website:
-
uckfield.foodbank.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window