Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF NORTH ABINGDON

Charity number: 1153844
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £658.97k £650.33k £765.57k £826.83k £863.01k
Total expenditure £613.42k £628.93k £691.58k £731.32k £832.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £24.59k £16.92k N/A £2.50k £3.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £627.68k £609.91k £701.69k £719.72k £740.34k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £17.51k £22.30k £41.62k £55.97k £60.99k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £13.78k £18.13k £22.26k £51.14k £61.68k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £14.43k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £613.42k £628.93k £691.58k £731.32k £832.28k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £1.26k £1.26k £1.35k £1.47k £1.53k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0