ROYAL MERCHANT NAVY EDUCATION FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Foundation's object is to contribute to the maintenance and education of its beneficiaries, called Foundationers, to enable them to take up suitable careers: in short, education for employment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income:
£563,395
Donations and legacies | £23.29k | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £540.10k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£753,452
Raising funds | £181.68k | |
Charitable activities | £571.77k | |
Other | £0 |
£1,581,188 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £181.68k | |
Charitable expenditure | £571.77k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £181.68k | |
Charitable expenditure | £571.77k | |
Retained for future use | £1.39m |
People

3 Employee(s)
7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 09 August 2013: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lesley Ann Robinson LLB | Chair | 02 August 2013 |
|
|
||||||||||
Linda Cotton | Trustee | 23 January 2025 |
|
|||||||||||
COMMODORE WILLIAM MICHAEL WALWORTH CBE | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|||||||||||
EMMA MCKENDRICK BA | Trustee | 04 February 2021 |
|
|||||||||||
Simon Nicholas Cooper DL | Trustee | 04 February 2021 |
|
|||||||||||
Commodore The Honourable Michael Charles Nicholas Cochrane | Trustee | 14 June 2018 |
|
|||||||||||
Dr RODNEY OWEN-JONES | Trustee | 21 October 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £434.51k | £553.93k | £480.94k | £560.88k | £563.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £417.71k | £758.08k | £1.09m | £599.52k | £753.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £759 | N/A | £10.07k | £23.29k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £553.17k | N/A | £549.79k | £540.10k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | £1.02k | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £607.20k | N/A | £416.48k | £571.77k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £150.88k | N/A | £183.04k | £181.68k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £7.16k | N/A | £12.58k | £9.02k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | £162.77k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £139.10k | N/A | £149.68k | £181.68k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | £14.76k | N/A | £11.61k | £1.96k | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | £20.94m | N/A | £20.89m | £22.15m | |
|
Other assets | N/A | £200.04k | N/A | £12.80k | £96.25k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | £472.70k | N/A | £742.27k | £693.46k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 11 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 11 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 22 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 22 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 21 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 21 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 20 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 20 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 15 July 2021 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 15 July 2021 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 09 Aug 2013 as amended on 28 Feb 2020 as amended on 14 Dec 2022
Charitable objects
The objects of the Foundation are in order of priority: a) to afford charitable benefit and relief to Foundationers by providing for or towards their maintenance and education in accordance with the principles of Christian religion and morality and by assisting them in training for and taking up employment; and b) to support the charitable objects of organisations that operate predominantly in Great Britain and that have activities which could include contributing towards the maintenance training or education of Foundationers. Provided that: “Foundationers” means the children and young people who are in need and are the natural or adopted children or other legal dependants of a person who has served or is serving at sea in the Merchant Navy or Fishing Fleet or the Royal National Lifeboat Institution provided in either case that priority may be given to Foundationers who are British or have at least one British parent. A person “serving at sea in the Merchant Navy” means any seafarer working in any capacity aboard a merchant vessel which includes but is not limited to passenger liners, ferries, container ships, tankers, bulk carriers, break bulk and refrigerated cargo ships, Royal Fleet Auxiliaries (or their equivalent), coasters, specialist ships (e.g. RNLI lifeboats, deep sea tugs, salvage vessels. oil support vessels, lighthouse tenders etc), luxury or charter yachts. A person serving at sea in the “Fishing Fleet” means any seafarer working in any capacity aboard inshore or deep-sea fishing vessels. A person “serving at sea in the Royal National Lifeboat Institution” means any crew-member of a lifeboat operated by this Institution.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1a Charnham Lane
Hungerford
BERKSHIRE
RG17 0EY
- Phone:
- 01488567890
- Email:
- office@rmnef.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window