WEST MOOR RESIDENTS ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide activities and new experiences to people in the local community. Activities include toddler groups, carpet bowls, youth clubs, womens group, craft club, slimming club, summer playscheme, lunch clubs, trips, Christmas lunches and anything else that people ask that they would like to try and revenue permits.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North Tyneside
Governance
- 24 February 1975: Standard registration
- 22 February 2016: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 22 February 2016: Funds transferred to 1163694 WEST MOOR RESIDENTS ASSOCIATION
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £77.20k | £72.91k | £76.81k | £87.09k | £90.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £75.93k | £66.26k | £66.89k | £92.08k | £82.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 14 July 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 14 July 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 22 June 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | 23 June 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 24 June 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 26 June 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 06 September 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 07 June 2012 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 APRIL 1970
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF WEST MOOR AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE AREA OF BENEFIT) WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROMOTE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. B) TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE CENTRE) AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE OR TO CO-OPERATE WITH ANY LOCAL STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE ASSOCIATION AND ITS CONSTITUTENT BODIES IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
WEST MOOR
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window