PCC HOLY TRINITY WITH ST LAURENCE CHURCH ALSO KNOWN AS MORECAMBE PARISH CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
An Anglican church community (a part of The Church of England) in the original part of Morecambe, known as Poulton-le-sands. The church has been here for over 275 years and is a grade 2 listed building. As a Church community, we have embarked on what we consider God is calling us to do in our parish. We have focussed on helping those who are struggling with food insecurity and financial concerns
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

16 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lancashire
Governance
- 23 October 2013: Previously excepted registration
- 22 September 2023: Funds received from 701921 MORECAMBE MENS COMMITTEE BENEVOLENT FUND
- MORECAMBE PARISH CHURCH (Working name)
- PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY POULTON - LE - SANDS WITH ST LAURENCE MORECAMBE (Previous name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Christopher James Michael Krawiec | Chair | 28 April 2019 |
|
|||||
james cooke | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mandy Fuller | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tina Violet White | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Clark Whyte | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Kate Stockton | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Graham Anthony Baylis Blick | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Livermore | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Marie Armstrong | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Anthony Woodhouse | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Katherine Laura Gill | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Prescott | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Chelsie Collier | Trustee | 08 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
RUTH LOUISA NIGHTINGALE | Trustee | 22 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
CAROL BENNETT | Trustee | 22 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
CAROL ANN OGDEN | Trustee | 22 October 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £84.42k | £93.94k | £131.11k | £186.21k | £239.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £99.57k | £153.58k | £182.51k | £212.04k | £273.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £4.00k | £7.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 08 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 04 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 17 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O The Rectory
Church Walk
MORECAMBE
LA4 5PR
- Phone:
- 01524422211
- Email:
- hello@MorecambeParish.Church
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window