Financial history GHAUS-E-YAGANA FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1153343
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £3.31k £2.17k £1.71k £1.51k £1.38k
Total expenditure £2.58k £4.07k £2.62k £824 £1.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A