OUR HOME NAKURU

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A children's home and community development project in Nakuru, Kenya that aims to education the country's poorest and most vulnerable communities and alleviate poverty through empowerment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Kenya
Governance
- 19 November 2013: Standard registration
- OHN (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FARID MUSHTAQ | Trustee | 24 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
FELIM LALLY | Trustee | 06 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
JESSICA VANCE | Trustee | 06 August 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.48k | £5.56k | £5.46k | £2.78k | £4.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.71k | £6.31k | £3.30k | £4.73k | £6.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24/04/2013 AS AMENDED ON 11/10/2013
Charitable objects
1) TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN LIVING IN KENYA WHO HAVE EXPERIENCED POVERTY, ABUSE OR NEGLECT BY THE PROVISION OF SHELTER, FOOD, EDUCATION AND SUCH OTHER SUPPORT IN A SAFE AND SECURE ENVIRONMENT AND WORKING WITH THE FAMILIES OF SUCH CHILDREN TO ADDRESS THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC NEEDS. 2) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP IN KENYA BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, HEALTHCARE PROJECTS AND ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT. 3) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY AMONG YOUNG PEOPLE. 4) TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES IN KENYA IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY. 5) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AMONG PEOPLE LIVING IN KENYA THROUGH THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, SUPPORT AND PRACTICAL ADVICE.
Area of benefit
KENYA
Contact information
- Address:
-
30 College Road
Bromsgrove
B60 2NF
- Phone:
- +46721521733
- Email:
- billyjones267@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window