THE NIRAMAX AND SENECA TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To help fund and provide support for the advancement of new skills and training to relieve long term unemployed for the public benefit of the people of Hartlepool through a route way to work
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Hartlepool
Governance
- 17 September 2013: Standard registration
- 05 November 2024: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- THE NIRAMAX TRUST (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.08k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 14/08/2013 AS AMENDED ON 17/09/2013
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF NEW SKILLS AND TRAINING TO RELIEVE LONG TERM UNEMPLOYED FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO RESIDENTS OF HARTLEPOOL THROUGH A "ROUTEWAY" INTO WORK.
Area of benefit
HARTLEPOOL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window