THE SPITZ CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Spitz Charitable Trust aims to relieve isolation in local communities through the power of live music. The charity works with professional musicians to engage older people in care homes and residential housing through participatory music sessions, and also link them with young people to create a positive impact on the lives of everyone involved.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £750 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Hackney
- Haringey
- Islington
- Lewisham
Governance
- 16 December 2013: CIO registration
- THE SPITZ (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Sarah Rutherford | Chair | 07 March 2016 |
|
|||||
Perri Lewis | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
MARVIN BROWNE | Trustee | 03 September 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £76.69k | £151.84k | £153.48k | £157.61k | £136.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £69.28k | £89.04k | £129.31k | £143.63k | £189.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £1.02k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £13.71k | £1.60k | N/A | N/A | £750 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 01 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 25 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 16 Dec 2013
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE; 1. TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH: (A) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. (B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES THAT DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS. 2. TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF ELDERLY PEOPLE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL OR LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES, PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
272A St Pauls Road
London
N1 2LJ
- Phone:
- 07713266467
- Email:
- Janeglitre@spitz.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window