Trustees THE WILMSLOW GREEN ROOM SOCIETY
Charity Number: 1153665

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL DAVID LEWIS | Chair | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Celia Bonner | Trustee | 17 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Reynolds | Trustee | 17 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mark Jonathan Stephen Jephcott | Trustee | 12 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr John Raymond Chidgey | Trustee | 12 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lorna Kathryn Kong | Trustee | 12 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
BRUCE MARSHALL WILLIAMS | Trustee | 24 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
DENISE REGINE SOUSSI | Trustee | 24 August 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.