Police Children's Fund

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the care and education of children of deceased or medically retired police officers from subscribing forces in England and Wales.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 October 2009: Standard registration
- THE GURNEY FUND (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tim Packham | Chair | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE ELIZABETH ROPER | Trustee | 07 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
WARREN FRANKLIN | Trustee | 08 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN MARK ROSS | Trustee | 08 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Ann Nolan | Trustee | 02 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Rachel Anne Darby | Trustee | 04 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Garry Robert Smith | Trustee | 05 May 2022 |
|
|||||
THOMAS WILLIAM ARTHUR | Trustee | 05 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Matthew Carter-Lang | Trustee | 05 August 2021 |
|
|||||
MELANIE WARNES | Trustee | 05 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian John Simmons | Trustee | 12 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mark Tyler | Trustee | 12 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £475.44k | £406.38k | £410.85k | £422.52k | £417.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £927.33k | £997.81k | £917.05k | £1.09m | £981.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23 MAY 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/11/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 25/02/2014 as amended on 17 Oct 2023 as amended on 17 Nov 2023 as amended on 24 Sept 2024
Charitable objects
The relief of children in need by reason of financial hardship or other social or economic disadvantage, including by supporting the advancement of their education and personal development, to enable them to contribute to society as mature and responsible individuals. In this Article: ‘children’ shall include young adults still in education, and shall mean a child or adopted child of a relevant officer. The Trustees may consider applications relating to a step-child of a relevant officer if they consider that the step-child was substantially supported by the relevant officer, or children of a serving officer from one of the contributing Police Forces where it is the officer’s spouse that is deceased, causing hardship. ‘relevant officer’ shall mean a deceased officer or ex-officer, or an officer retired on medical grounds, who were serving with one of the contributing Police Forces at their death or retirement.
Linked charities
- 28 October 2009 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Bath Road
Worthing
BN11 3NU
- Phone:
- 01903237256
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window