Financial history EWYAS HAROLD PRE-SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1153965
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £56.08k £46.31k £59.05k £53.27k £79.89k
Total expenditure £46.40k £45.43k £60.80k £62.79k £61.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £46.95k N/A N/A £41.68k £68.63k